Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Chen Bolu (Chen Bailu)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Daming [Taming], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1913Born
29 Jun 194027.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 198673.1Ordained BishopBishop of Daming [Taming], China
Sep 1999³86.3ResignedBishop of Daming [Taming], China
5 Nov 200996.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Daming [Taming], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Chen Bolu (Chen Bailu)
Bishop Peter Chen Bolu (Chen Bailu) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Daming [Taming]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHandan, Diocese of Daming [Taming]
Death PlaceDazhong

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,115
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast