Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sun Jigen

Bishop of Daming [Taming], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Handan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1967² Born
1995²28.0Ordained PriestPriest
2010²43.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Daming [Taming], China
21 Jun 201144.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Daming [Taming], China
2016¹49.0SucceededBishop of Daming [Taming], China
16 Nov 201750.8InstalledBishop of Daming [Taming], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sun Jigen
Bishop Joseph Sun Jigen (born 1967) Bishop of Daming [Taming]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHandan, Diocese of Daming [Taming]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Daming [Taming].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast