Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Yang Xiangtai

Bishop Emeritus of Daming [Taming], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Handan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1922 Born
27 Aug 194926.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 199674.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Daming [Taming], China
17 Sep 199976.8SucceededBishop of Daming [Taming], China
2016¹93.1RetiredBishop of Daming [Taming], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Yang Xiangtai
Bishop Stephen Yang Xiangtai (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Daming [Taming]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Daming [Taming].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • c2+: CB, 29 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast