Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Wu Junwei

Bishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1963 Born
1990²26.5Ordained PriestPriest
May 2009³45.8AppointedBishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China
21 Sep 201047.2Ordained BishopBishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Wu Junwei
Bishop Peter Wu Junwei (born ) Bishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopXinjiang, Prefecture Apostolic of Xinjiang [Kiangchow]

Please contact the Bishop through the Prefecture Apostolic of Xinjiang [Kiangchow].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast