Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Meng Ningyou

Bishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1963² Born
1991²28.0Ordained PriestPriest of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China
16 Sep 201047.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China
24 Nov 201350.8SucceededBishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Meng Ningyou
Bishop Paul Meng Ningyou (born 1963) Bishop of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaiyuan, Archdiocese of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]
Ordained BishopTaiyuan, Archdiocese of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Taiyuan [Taiyüan].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast