Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Dec 1965³ | Born | ||
19 May 1991 | 25.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
9 Apr 2019 | 53.3 | Selected | Bishop of Jining [Tsining], China |
26 Aug 2019 | 53.7 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Jining [Tsining], China |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Jining, Diocese of Jining [Tsining] |
Ordained Bishop | Our Lady of the Rosary, Cathedral, Jining, Diocese of Jining [Tsining] |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠