Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Li Jing

Bishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (coad/Bameng)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1968 Born
8 Aug 199627.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 200638.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
21 Dec 200739.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
Dec 2009³41.0SucceededBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Li Jing
Bishop Joseph Li Jing (born ) Bishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBameng
Ordained BishopYinchuan, Diocese of Yinchuan [Ningsia]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yinchuan [Ningsia].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast