Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Vicariate Apostolic of Ninghsia | |||
14 March 1922 | Erected | Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale} | Vicariate Apostolic of Ninghsia (erected) |
Diocese of Yinchuan [Ningsia] | |||
11 April 1946 | Elevated | Vicariate Apostolic of Ninghsia | Diocese of Yinchuan [Ningsia] |
8 January 1948 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Yinchuan [Ningsia] (Paotowien) | Archdiocese of Hohhot [Suiyüan] |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Yinchuan [Ningsia] | ||||||||||||
1950 | 35,313 | 1,000,000 | 3.5% | 34 | 16 | 50 | 706 | 67 | 44 | ap2002 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 19 Jun 2023 |
✠