Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Schotte, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ninghsia, China

Titular Bishop of Petinessus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1881Born
190119.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Jul 190725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Dec 193150.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ninghsia, China
14 Dec 193150.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Petinessus
10 Apr 193250.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petinessus
13 Jan 194462.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Ninghsia, China

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Schotte
Bishop Gaspare Schotte C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ninghsia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarckem, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
Ordained BishopNingsia
Death PlaceSanshengkung

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,932, Number 17
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast