Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Haarlem-Amsterdam

Dioecesis Harlemensis-Amstelodamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 7 October 2008
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Utrecht
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Netherlands
  • Square Kilometers: 2,912 (1,124 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bisdomhaarlem.nl/
  • Mailing Address: Nieuwe Gracht 80, 2011 NJ Haarlem, Nederland
  • Telephone: (023)511.2600
  • Fax: 511.2629

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Haarlem
12 May 1559ErectedDiocese of Utrecht Diocese of Haarlem (erected)
1587SuppressedDiocese of Haarlem (suppressed)
Diocese of Haarlem
4 March 1853ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Batavia (Holland Mission) Diocese of Haarlem (erected)
16 July 1955Territory LostDiocese of Haarlem Diocese of Rotterdam (erected)
Diocese of Haarlem-Amsterdam
7 October 2008Name ChangedDiocese of Haarlem Diocese of Haarlem-Amsterdam

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Haarlem
19501,286,4124,200,00030.6%8482791,1271,1418507,502318ap1951
1969731,0002,215,87633.0%4734799527678162,557223ap1971
1980765,0002,355,00032.5%3473977441,02847152,567219ap1981
1990695,3642,434,87528.6%2462905361,29775081,996212ap1991
1999539,5612,628,12120.5%1722103821,412133121,264181ap2000
2000531,3222,655,81820.0%2031773801,398172781,207190ap2001
2001530,2452,678,37719.8%226662921,815201561,138178ap2002
2002515,6232,703,31519.1%214552691,91620881,074177ap2003
2003512,8562,728,73918.8%207492562,00325128975171ap2004
2004522,1652,748,32019.0%190442342,23126121911173ap2005
2006530,6272,780,31319.1%194382322,28734103836165ap2007
Diocese of Haarlem-Amsterdam

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Nov 2013