Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaas Van Nieuwland

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1510Born
6 Jul 154131.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
6 Jul 154131.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
11 Sep 154131.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
10 Mar 156150.7AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
1569²58.5ResignedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
15 Jun 158070.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Haarlem, Netherlands

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaas Van Nieuwland (VIAF: 290493878)
Bishop Nicolaas Van Nieuwland (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaartensdijk
Ordained BishopVicogne, Abbey, Hainaut
Death PlaceMaastenodigh

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Mar 2014
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,087
  • ~c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,434

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast