Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornélio Veerman, C.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Cametá, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1908BornVolendam, Netherlands
21 Jul 193526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
3 May 195344.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cametá, Para, Brazil
27 Feb 196152.3AppointedPrelate of Cametá, Para, Brazil
27 Feb 196152.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Numida
22 May 196152.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numida
8 Aug 196960.8ResignedPrelate of Cametá, Para, Brazil
30 Nov 197062.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Numida
12 Sep 199485.8DiedPrelate Emeritus of Cametá, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cornélio Veerman:
Bishop Cornélio Veerman C.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Cametá

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013