Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Gerard Constantin Kramer, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Changzhi [Luan]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1903BornOldenklooster, Netherlands
192117.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 Mar 192824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Feb 194642.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Luanfu, China
7 Feb 194642.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
25 Mar 194642.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
11 Apr 194642.9AppointedBishop of Changzhi [Luan], China
1983¹79.6ResignedBishop of Changzhi [Luan], China
24 Jan 199894.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Changzhi [Luan], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Gerard Constantin Kramer:
Bishop Franciscus Gerard Constantin Kramer O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Changzhi [Luan]

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 51.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013