Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Julian Oste, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jinzhou [Jehol]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1893BornZele, Belgium
191117.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 Nov 192027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
9 Apr 194855.0AppointedBishop of Jinzhou [Jehol], China
28 Oct 194855.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jinzhou [Jehol], China
19 Jan 197177.8DiedBishop of Jinzhou [Jehol], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Julian Oste:
Bishop Joseph Julian Oste C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Jinzhou [Jehol]

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013