Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachin (Gioacchino Domenico) Salvetti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)

Titular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1769BornBagno di Casciano, Italy
178717.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 May 179324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Feb 181546.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China
21 Feb 181546.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
16 Feb 181748.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
21 Sep 184374.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China

MicroData Summary for Joachin (Gioacchino Domenico) Salvetti
Bishop Joachin (Gioacchino Domenico) Salvetti O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 3
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 May 2016