Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-Jean-François Verrolles, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}

Titular Bishop of Columbica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1805BornVendredi-Saint, France
31 May 182823.1Ordained PriestPriest
1830¹24.7ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 Dec 183833.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China
11 Dec 183833.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Columbica
8 Nov 184035.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Columbica
29 Apr 187873.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-Jean-François Verrolles (VIAF: 81014454)
Bishop Emmanuel-Jean-François Verrolles M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 157
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016