Catholic-Hierarchy DC

João Cosme Cardinal da Cunha (de Nossa Senhora da Porta), O.C.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1715Born
15 May 174024.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 May 174024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
2 Jan 174630.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Leiria, Portugal
28 Mar 174630.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Leiria, Portugal
28 Mar 174630.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
8 Apr 174630.5SucceededBishop of Leiria, Portugal
29 Jun 174630.7Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
30 Nov 175944.1SelectedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
24 Mar 176044.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
6 Aug 177054.8Elevated to Cardinal
31 Jan 178367.3DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João Cosme da Cunha (de Nossa Senhora da Porta)
João Cosme Cardinal da Cunha (de Nossa Senhora da Porta) O.C.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
  • a cardinal for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Aug 1770
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 206, and Page 257
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017