Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Lemos de Faria Pereira Coutinho

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1735Born
31 Dec 175924.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jan 176024.7Ordained PriestPriest
Sep 177338.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
13 Apr 177438.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
13 Apr 177438.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
25 Sep 177439.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
29 Aug 177944.3SucceededBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
16 Apr 182286.9DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Lemos de Faria Pereira Coutinho
Bishop Francisco de Lemos de Faria Pereira Coutinho (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 47.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 172, and Page 450
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,491
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017