Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Marcelino dos Santos Homem Aparício

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1719³Born
26 Jun 174021.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jun 174021.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 177354.2SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
20 Dec 177354.6ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
24 Feb 177454.8Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
21 May 178263.0DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Marcelino dos Santos Homem Aparício
Bishop João Marcelino dos Santos Homem Aparício (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSetubal

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 85
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,961
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017