Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Joaquim Torrão

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Lagania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1709³Born
6 Apr 173323.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 177363.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal
8 Mar 177363.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
3 Oct 177363.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Joaquim Torrão
Bishop António Joaquim Torrão (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerpa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 258, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017