Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquim Borges de Figueroa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1714³BornLisboa, Portugal
21 Sep 177056.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 177056.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 177156.8SelectedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
17 Jun 177157.0ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
28 Oct 177157.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mariana, Brazil
29 Dec 177258.5SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
8 Mar 177358.7ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
13 Jul 177864.1ResignedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
25 Sep 178874.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Borges de Figueroa:
Archbishop Joaquim Borges de Figueroa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 18.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 277, and Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015