Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Dantas Barbosa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1703Born
20 Dec 172724.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 174339.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
11 Mar 174339.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
9 Jun 174339.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
13 Jul 177067.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for José Dantas Barbosa
Archbishop José Dantas Barbosa (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 250, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017