Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Nogueira

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1703³Born
21 Dec 172623.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Feb 172824.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 175249.1SelectedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
29 Jan 175349.3ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
25 Jul 175349.8Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1758¹54.2DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Nogueira
Bishop Antonio Nogueira (born , died 1758) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElvas

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017