Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manoel de Santa Ines Ferreira, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1704³BornCascais, Portugal
27 Jun 172823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
1 Sep 174541.1SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
15 Dec 174541.4ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
13 Mar 174641.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
5 Mar 177065.6SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
6 Aug 177066.1ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
22 Jun 177166.9DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manoel de Santa Ines Ferreira:
Archbishop Manoel de Santa Ines Ferreira O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179, and Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015