Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João da Cruz Salgado de Castilho, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1695³Born
17 Dec 171823.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Discalced Carmelites
4 Mar 171924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
22 Feb 173944.1SelectedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
19 Dec 174045.9ConfirmedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
5 Feb 174146.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
4 Dec 174550.9ResignedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
17 Nov 174954.8SelectedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
19 Jan 175055.0ConfirmedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
20 Oct 175661.7DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João da Cruz Salgado de Castilho
Bishop João da Cruz Salgado de Castilho O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 291, and Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017