Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de São Tiago, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1692³Born
7 Jun 171624.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jun 171624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Sep 174553.3SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
15 Dec 174553.6ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
13 Mar 174653.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
18 Dec 175260.6DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de São Tiago
Bishop Francisco de São Tiago O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiagro de Sappro, Portugal

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017