Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Rodrigues Nogueira

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1695³Born
7 Jun 172227.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Jul 172227.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 174550.3SelectedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
15 Dec 174550.6ConfirmedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
13 Mar 174650.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
7 Nov 174853.5DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Rodrigues Nogueira
Bishop Bernardo Rodrigues Nogueira (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Marinha

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017