Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Das Chagas (des Saint Plaies), O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1709³BornAlcabedigues, Portugal
21 Sep 173424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
30 Sep 174535.7SelectedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
15 Dec 174535.9ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
13 Mar 174636.2Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1747¹37.0DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Das Chagas (des Saint Plaies):
Bishop Ludovico Das Chagas (des Saint Plaies) O.E.S.A. (born , died 1747) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a priest for 12.2 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,075
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016