Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Xavier Aranha

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1692³Born
21 Dec 172028.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 172129.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 175461.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Olinda, Brazil
11 Feb 175461.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
21 Jul 175462.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
17 Nov 175765.5SucceededBishop of Olinda, Brazil
5 Oct 177179.4DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Xavier Aranha
Bishop Francisco Xavier Aranha (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArronches

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 317, and Page 403

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017