Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Caetano da Rocha

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1699³BornUlixbonen
11 Jul 173031.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jul 173031.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 175657.2AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
21 Sep 175657.3Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
21 Jul 177273.2DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Caetano da Rocha:
Bishop António Caetano da Rocha (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 85
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013