Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Acciaioli

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1700BornRome, Italy
2 Dec 174343.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
8 Dec 174343.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 174343.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
22 Jan 174443.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
28 Jan 175453.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
24 Sep 175959.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Feb 176160.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
6 Apr 176161.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
24 Jan 176362.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ancona e Numana, Italy
24 Jul 176666.4DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Acciaioli:
Cardinal Filippo Acciaioli (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 22.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 82, and Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013