Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Maurizio Caissotti, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1726BornTorino
5 Jun 175124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
10 Feb 176235.1SelectedBishop of Asti, Italy
19 Apr 176235.3ConfirmedBishop of Asti, Italy
23 May 176235.4Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
8 Aug 178659.6DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Maurizio Caissotti:
Bishop Paolo Maurizio Caissotti C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016