Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tiberio Borghesi

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1720³BornSiena
21 Sep 174323.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 176241.6AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
4 Apr 176241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
1 Jun 177251.8AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
Mar 1792³71.5DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tiberio Borghesi:
Archbishop Tiberio Borghesi (born , died Mar 1792) Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375, and Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015