Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Maria Vincentini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Teodosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1700³BornRieti
17 Sep 172424.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 174242.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
9 Sep 174242.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
6 Jul 175454.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Maria Vincentini
Archbishop Michele Maria Vincentini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Teodosia

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Nov 2016