Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio della Chiesa de Rodi

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1704BornTorino
8 Apr 173025.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Jun 173025.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 174642.3AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
4 Dec 174642.3Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
29 Jul 175854.0DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio della Chiesa de Rodi:
Bishop Ignazio della Chiesa de Rodi (born , died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015