Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mattino Ignazio Caracciolo

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1713BornMartina
20 Oct 174330.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Oct 174330.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 174330.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
21 Dec 174330.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
6 Aug 175441.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon

MicroData Summary for Mattino Ignazio Caracciolo:
Archbishop Mattino Ignazio Caracciolo (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon

  • a priest for 10.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015