Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Gualterio

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1706BornOrvieto, Italy
30 Nov 174236.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 174337.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
19 Jan 174437.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
20 Mar 174437.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Jan 1754³47.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
1 May 175447.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
24 Sep 175952.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 175952.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
24 Mar 176053.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
24 Jul 176154.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Gualterio (VIAF: 299903900)
Luigi Cardinal Gualterio (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

  • a priest for 18.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 1
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016