Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Hachette des Portes, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Glandèves


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1712¹BornReims
21 Sep 173725.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Mar 174028.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 175543.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
21 Jul 175543.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
31 Aug 175543.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
1 Jul 177159.5SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
22 Jun 177260.4ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
1798¹86.0DiedBishop of Glandèves, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri Hachette des Portes: VIAF:88887246
Bishop Henri Hachette des Portes O. Carm. (born 1712, died 1798) Bishop of Glandèves

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 70, and Page 226
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015