Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François-Gabriel d’Orléans de La Motte

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1683BornCarpentras
28 Aug 173350.6SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
24 Mar 173451.1ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
4 Jul 173451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
10 Jul 177491.4DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-François-Gabriel d’Orléans de La Motte:
Bishop Louis-François-Gabriel d’Orléans de La Motte (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015