Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Sextius de Jarente de La Bruyère

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1706BornMarseille
23 Oct 174640.0SelectedBishop of Digne, France
10 Apr 174740.5ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
17 Sep 174740.9Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
29 Jan 175851.3SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
28 Feb 175851.4ResignedBishop of Digne, France
13 Mar 175851.4ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
28 May 178881.6DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Sextius de Jarente de La Bruyère:
Bishop Louis-Sextius de Jarente de La Bruyère (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 107, and Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015