Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-François de Malide

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1730BornParis
6 Jul 176635.9SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
6 Aug 176636.0ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
31 Aug 176636.1Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
16 Jan 177443.5SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
25 Feb 177443.6ResignedBishop of Avranches, France
9 May 177443.8ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
18 Jan 181281.5DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-François de Malide:
Bishop Joseph-François de Malide (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 61, and Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015