Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Bruno de Bausset-Roquefort

Deceased

Bishop of Béziers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1702BornAubagne
7 Nov 174543.6SelectedBishop of Béziers, France
9 Mar 174643.9ConfirmedBishop of Béziers, France
1 May 174644.1Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
26 Jun 177169.2DiedBishop of Béziers, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Bruno de Bausset-Roquefort:
Bishop Joseph Bruno de Bausset-Roquefort (born , died ) Bishop of Béziers

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015