Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ercole Visconti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornMilano, Italy
18 Jul 167832.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
31 Jul 167832.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
15 Nov 167832.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
12 Oct 168034.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
13 Oct 168034.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Jul 1687³41.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
1712¹66.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ercole Visconti (VIAF: 310608413)
Archbishop Ercole Visconti (born 1646, died 1712) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Germany

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 23
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016