Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Baldassare Cardinal Cenci (Sr.)

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹BornRome
26 Aug 169143.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 169143.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
30 Sep 169143.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
12 Dec 169547.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
11 Nov 169749.8Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 169749.8AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
2 Dec 169749.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
26 May 170961.4DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baldassare Cenci (Sr.):
Baldassare Cardinal Cenci (Sr.) (born 1648, died ) Archbishop of Fermo

  • a priest for 17.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015