Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Paolo Aleotti

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1666³Born
16 May 169832.3AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
18 May 169832.3Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
30 Sep 170438.6DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simone Paolo Aleotti
Bishop Simone Paolo Aleotti (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlž, Diocese of Forli

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,698, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast