Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Sallustio Fadulfi

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1641BornTerni
18 Dec 167231.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 167938.7AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
30 Nov 167938.8Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
15 Jan 168543.9AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
6 Jan 169957.9DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Sallustio Fadulfi:
Bishop Giuseppe Sallustio Fadulfi (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 81, and Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015