Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Trotti

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornAlessandria
11 Oct 166633.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
24 Oct 166633.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
20 Nov 166633.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
10 Apr 166835.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
25 Apr 166835.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Apr 1671³38.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
12 Dec 167239.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pavia, Italy
30 Sep 170067.7DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Trotti
Archbishop Lorenzo Trotti (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 306
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 136
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 18
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016