Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giorgio Cardinal Cornaro

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1658BornVenezia
7 Apr 169233.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Apr 169233.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 169233.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
6 May 169233.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
11 May 169233.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
22 Jul 169738.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 Aug 169739.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Padova {Padua}, Italy
3 Nov 169739.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
7 Apr 169839.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
10 Aug 172264.0DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Cornaro (VIAF: 89065367)
Giorgio Cardinal Cornaro (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
  • a cardinal for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jul 1697
  • c34: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 16
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Nov 2016