Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Gregorio Giuseppe Gaetani de Aragonia

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹BornPiedimonte, Italy
24 Feb 167633.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
15 Mar 167633.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
4 Apr 167633.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
15 Jun 167835.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
2 May 169552.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
12 Aug 171067.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Giuseppe Gaetani de Aragonia
Patriarch Gregorio Giuseppe Gaetani de Aragonia (born 1643, died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 77, and Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016