Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pérez de la Lastra

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1631Born
29 Mar 165927.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 167947.3AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
19 Mar 167947.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
14 Jan 170068.3DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pérez de la Lastra
Bishop Antonio Pérez de la Lastra (born , died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantillán, Spain

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 219, Number 1,359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast